THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:42:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West, Unit 601
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: (905) 281-9143
Address: Humber River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leon Rivlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rivlin (CPSO#: 70156 )
Business Address: Suite 601
89 The Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 281-9898

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West, Unit 601
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: (905) 281-9143
Address: Humber River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leon Rivlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rivlin (CPSO#: 70156 )
Business Address: Suite 601
89 The Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 281-9898

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEON RIVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEON RIVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996