THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:47:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Commercial Street Medical Centre
Suite 202
311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-2021
Fax: (905) 876-2507

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Watada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Watada (CPSO#: 70157 )
Business Address: 202 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 876-2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Commercial Street Medical Centre
Suite 202
311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 876-2021
Fax: (905) 876-2507

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Watada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Watada (CPSO#: 70157 )
Business Address: 202 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 876-2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN HIDEKI WATADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATADA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN HIDEKI WATADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATADA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996