THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 716 The Queensway S
Keswick ON L4P 4C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-476-0308
Fax: 855-314-4866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pin Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chung (CPSO#: 70161 )
Business Address: Unit 9 - 76 Arlington Drive
Building B
Keswick Ontario L4P 0A9
(905) 476-0308
Business Address: 716 The Queensway S
Keswick ON L4P 4C9
9054760308

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 716 The Queensway S
Keswick ON L4P 4C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-476-0308
Fax: 855-314-4866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pin Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chung (CPSO#: 70161 )
Business Address: Unit 9 - 76 Arlington Drive
Building B
Keswick Ontario L4P 0A9
(905) 476-0308
Business Address: 716 The Queensway S
Keswick ON L4P 4C9
9054760308

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996