THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5803 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 371-1117
Fax: (905) 371-9986

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Werhun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Werhun (CPSO#: 70166 )
Business Address: 5803 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z6
(905) 371-1117

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5803 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 371-1117
Fax: (905) 371-9986

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Werhun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Werhun (CPSO#: 70166 )
Business Address: 5803 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z6
(905) 371-1117

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT STEVEN WERHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERHUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT STEVEN WERHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERHUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996