THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:51:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 511
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-8353
Fax: (416) 438-6503

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Boutros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Boutros (CPSO#: 70170 )
Business Address: Suite 511
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 439-8353

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 511
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-8353
Fax: (416) 438-6503

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Boutros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Boutros (CPSO#: 70170 )
Business Address: Suite 511
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 439-8353

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARID SHAWKI AMIN BOUTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTROS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARID SHAWKI AMIN BOUTROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTROS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996