THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1750 The Queensway
Olive MD
Unit 6
Unit 6
Toronto Ontario M9C 5H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-238-8492
Fax: 1-888-605-1164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Dimitrakoudis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dimitrakoudis (CPSO#: 70176 )
Business Address: Suite 4S-406
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 604-9500
Business Address: 14 Wimbleton Crescent
Toronto Ontario M9A 3X6
416-819-6468

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1750 The Queensway
Olive MD
Unit 6
Unit 6
Toronto Ontario M9C 5H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-238-8492
Fax: 1-888-605-1164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Dimitrakoudis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dimitrakoudis (CPSO#: 70176 )
Business Address: Suite 4S-406
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 604-9500
Business Address: 14 Wimbleton Crescent
Toronto Ontario M9A 3X6
416-819-6468

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA MARIA DIMITRAKOUDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMITRAKOUDIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENA MARIA DIMITRAKOUDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIMITRAKOUDIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996