THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Harvard Medical School, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Friedrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Friedrich (CPSO#: 70194 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Harvard Medical School, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Friedrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Friedrich (CPSO#: 70194 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAN OLIVER FRIEDRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDRICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAN OLIVER FRIEDRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDRICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Harvard Medical School, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996