THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-523-1616
Fax: 905-523-6114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Hutchings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hutchings (CPSO#: 70203 )
Business Address: 801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
905-523-1616
Business Address: 3331 Line 4 North
Oro-Medonte Ontario L0L 2L0
(705) 835-7525
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 186 Erie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Z 4T3
(705) 445-9711
Business Address: Stayner Medical and Dental Clinic
7477 Highway 26
P O Box 220
Stayner Ontario L0M 1S0
(705) 428-3246
Business Address: 203-801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Business Address: 801 Mohawk Rd W
Dr. L Hutchings Medicine
Suite 203
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-523-1616
Fax: 905-523-6114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Hutchings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hutchings (CPSO#: 70203 )
Business Address: 801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
905-523-1616
Business Address: 3331 Line 4 North
Oro-Medonte Ontario L0L 2L0
(705) 835-7525
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550
Business Address: 186 Erie Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Z 4T3
(705) 445-9711
Business Address: Stayner Medical and Dental Clinic
7477 Highway 26
P O Box 220
Stayner Ontario L0M 1S0
(705) 428-3246
Business Address: 203-801 Mohawk Rd W
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2
Business Address: 801 Mohawk Rd W
Dr. L Hutchings Medicine
Suite 203
Hamilton ON L9C 6C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE-ANNE HUTCHINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINGS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE-ANNE HUTCHINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINGS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996