THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:54:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Paul Family Health Organization
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre 4th Fl
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Ann Gorcsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gorcsi (CPSO#: 70211 )
Business Address: 99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
St. Paul Family Health Network
4th Floor
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
(519) 756-6400
Business Address: 320 Colborne Street West
Brantford Ontario N3T 1M2
(519) 752-2639

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Paul Family Health Organization
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre 4th Fl
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Ann Gorcsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gorcsi (CPSO#: 70211 )
Business Address: 99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
St. Paul Family Health Network
4th Floor
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
(519) 756-6400
Business Address: 320 Colborne Street West
Brantford Ontario N3T 1M2
(519) 752-2639

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ANN GORCSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORCSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ANN GORCSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORCSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996