THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:54:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-4443
Fax: (905) 883-4477
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughn Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniele Camazzola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Camazzola (CPSO#: 70212 )
Business Address: Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
(905) 883-4443

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-4443
Fax: (905) 883-4477
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughn Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniele Camazzola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Camazzola (CPSO#: 70212 )
Business Address: Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
(905) 883-4443

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELE CARLO CAMAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMAZZOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELE CARLO CAMAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMAZZOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996