THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:47:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-8034
Fax: (905) 770-5637

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leung (CPSO#: 70213 )
Business Address: 9350 Yonge St
Suite 204
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5G2
905-770-8034
Business Address: Suite 212A
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5G2
(905) 770-8034
Business Address: 9350 Yonge St
Suite 204
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5G2
9057708034

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-8034
Fax: (905) 770-5637

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leung (CPSO#: 70213 )
Business Address: 9350 Yonge St
Suite 204
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5G2
905-770-8034
Business Address: Suite 212A
9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5G2
(905) 770-8034
Business Address: 9350 Yonge St
Suite 204
Richmond Hill ON L4C 5G2
9057708034

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MEE CHU LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MEE CHU LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996