THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:07:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Room
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5405
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 28-470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C1
Phone: 905-791-3458
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital ED
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheryl Seidman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seidman (CPSO#: 70217 )
Business Address: Oshawa Nuclear Medicine
300 King Street West
Suite 201
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: My Doctor Now
1835 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 3E7
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: My Doctor Now
24 - 279 Wharncliffe Road North
London Ontario N6H 2C2
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: Stouffville Nuclear & Cardiac Imaging
28 Saniford Drive
Stouffville Ontario L4A 7X5
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: MyHealth Centre
2 - 12050 Airport Road
Caledon Ontario L7C 2W1
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Room
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5405
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 28-470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C1
Phone: 905-791-3458
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital ED
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheryl Seidman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seidman (CPSO#: 70217 )
Business Address: Oshawa Nuclear Medicine
300 King Street West
Suite 201
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: My Doctor Now
1835 Dundas Street
London Ontario N5W 3E7
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: My Doctor Now
24 - 279 Wharncliffe Road North
London Ontario N6H 2C2
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: Stouffville Nuclear & Cardiac Imaging
28 Saniford Drive
Stouffville Ontario L4A 7X5
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: MyHealth Centre
2 - 12050 Airport Road
Caledon Ontario L7C 2W1
(416) 603-5405
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERYL GAIL SEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERYL GAIL SEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996