THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
4W W - 443
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-6441
Fax: (416) 603-5298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mojgan Hodaie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hodaie (CPSO#: 70218 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
4WW-443
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
416-603-6441

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
4W W - 443
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-6441
Fax: (416) 603-5298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mojgan Hodaie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hodaie (CPSO#: 70218 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
4WW-443
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
416-603-6441

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOJGAN HODAIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODAIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOJGAN HODAIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODAIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996