THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 404
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-476-3178
Fax: 226-336-8105
Address: 10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yee (CPSO#: 70233 )
Business Address: Wilfred Laurier University, Student Health
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3C5
(519) 884-0710 Extn: 3146
Business Address: 10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
(519) 783-0023
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 404
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
226-476-3178

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 404
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-476-3178
Fax: 226-336-8105
Address: 10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yee (CPSO#: 70233 )
Business Address: Wilfred Laurier University, Student Health
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3C5
(519) 884-0710 Extn: 3146
Business Address: 10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
(519) 783-0023
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 404
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
226-476-3178

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996