THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Victor Varma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Varma (CPSO#: 70235 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Victor Varma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Varma (CPSO#: 70235 )
Business Address: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAG VICTOR VARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARAG VICTOR VARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996