THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Credit Valley Rd
Suite 404
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-272-1104
Fax: 905-272-1105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Lipscombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipscombe (CPSO#: 70248 )
Business Address: 404-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
905-272-1104

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Credit Valley Rd
Suite 404
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-272-1104
Fax: 905-272-1105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Lipscombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipscombe (CPSO#: 70248 )
Business Address: 404-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
905-272-1104

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER BRIDGETTE LIPSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSCOMBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER BRIDGETTE LIPSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996