THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:09:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Extension: 223
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. H. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kim (CPSO#: 70252 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 210 - 430 The Broadwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 741-5252

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Extension: 223
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. H. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kim (CPSO#: 70252 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 210 - 430 The Broadwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 741-5252

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAHN HOE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAHN HOE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996