THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
KHSC
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 820 John Marks Avenue
Breast Imaging Kingston
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Phone: 613 384 4284
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 776 Blackburn Mews
KMI
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: 613 384 5488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.K. Jabs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jabs (CPSO#: 70253 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: KMRI/KMI
776 Blackburn Mews
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-1220
Business Address: OBSP
490 Discovery Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7L 5A2
(613) 384-4284
Business Address: Providence Care Centre
St. Mary's of the Lake Hospital
340 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4E6
(613) 544-5220
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 3020
Business Address: 820 John Marks Ave
BIK
Kingston ON K7K 0J7

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
KHSC
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 820 John Marks Avenue
Breast Imaging Kingston
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Phone: 613 384 4284
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 776 Blackburn Mews
KMI
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
Phone: 613 384 5488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.K. Jabs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jabs (CPSO#: 70253 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2301
Business Address: KMRI/KMI
776 Blackburn Mews
Kingston Ontario K7P 2N7
(613) 384-1220
Business Address: OBSP
490 Discovery Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7L 5A2
(613) 384-4284
Business Address: Providence Care Centre
St. Mary's of the Lake Hospital
340 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4E6
(613) 544-5220
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 3020
Business Address: 820 John Marks Ave
BIK
Kingston ON K7K 0J7

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DORIS KIRSTEN JABS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DORIS KIRSTEN JABS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996