THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:58:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Onorato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Onorato (CPSO#: 70263 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Onorato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Onorato (CPSO#: 70263 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ONORATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONORATO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ONORATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONORATO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996