THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waterview Medical Centre
464 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 245-1071
Fax: (289) 245-1486

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. KL Olsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Olsen (CPSO#: 70264 )
Business Address: 464 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V1
(289) 245-1071

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waterview Medical Centre
464 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 245-1071
Fax: (289) 245-1486

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. KL Olsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Olsen (CPSO#: 70264 )
Business Address: 464 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V1
(289) 245-1071

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA LYNN OLSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA LYNN OLSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996