THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 15:00:37 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 270 Carling Terrace
Wingham and District Hospital
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193573210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. & B. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marshall (CPSO#: 64292 ) Dr. S. Marshall (CPSO#: 70269 )
Business Address: Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-3210
Business Address: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: Braemar Retirement Home
719 Josephine Street
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-3430
Business Address: 271 Frances Street
P.O. Box 480
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-1325
Business Address: Walkerton Hospital
21 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 270 Carling Terrace
Wingham and District Hospital
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193573210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. & B. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marshall (CPSO#: 64292 ) Dr. S. Marshall (CPSO#: 70269 )
Business Address: Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-3210
Business Address: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: Braemar Retirement Home
719 Josephine Street
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-3430
Business Address: 271 Frances Street
P.O. Box 480
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-1325
Business Address: Walkerton Hospital
21 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN ALLAN MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN ALLAN MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996