THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Extension: 4319
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 459 Hume St
CGMH
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W9
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Miller (CPSO#: 70270 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000 Extn: 4319

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Extension: 4319
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 459 Hume St
CGMH
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W9
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Miller (CPSO#: 70270 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000 Extn: 4319

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA ELIZABETH JANE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA ELIZABETH JANE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996