THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3591 Innes Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 834 3444
Fax: (613) 824-5538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serge Lessard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lessard (CPSO#: 70271 )
Business Address: 3591 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
(613) 834-3444

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Lessard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3591 Innes Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 834 3444
Fax: (613) 824-5538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serge Lessard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lessard (CPSO#: 70271 )
Business Address: 3591 Innes Road
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
(613) 834-3444

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Lessard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERGE LESSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESSARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERGE LESSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESSARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996