THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sangers, Caroline Ann (Used Until: 18 Mar 2020) Macleod, Caroline Ann (Used Until: 31 Jul 2001)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: U Cosmetic Inc
1324 Princess St
Kingston Ontario K7M 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 536-5277
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 33 CF Health Services Centre
PO Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston Ontario K7K 7B4
Phone: 6135415010
Extension: 5508
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Macleod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Macleod (CPSO#: 70278 )
Business Address: U Cosmetic Inc
1324 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3E2
(613) 536-5277

General Information

Former Name: Sangers, Caroline Ann (Used Until: 18 Mar 2020) Macleod, Caroline Ann (Used Until: 31 Jul 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: U Cosmetic Inc
1324 Princess St
Kingston Ontario K7M 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 536-5277
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 33 CF Health Services Centre
PO Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston Ontario K7K 7B4
Phone: 6135415010
Extension: 5508
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Macleod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Macleod (CPSO#: 70278 )
Business Address: U Cosmetic Inc
1324 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 3E2
(613) 536-5277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANN MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANN MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996