THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:05:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 117
704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 344-9031
Fax: (519) 344-9044
Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Extension: 4448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elkelani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elkelani (CPSO#: 70291 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 117
704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 344-9031
Fax: (519) 344-9044
Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Extension: 4448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elkelani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elkelani (CPSO#: 70291 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAD MEHEMED ELKELANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKELANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAD MEHEMED ELKELANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKELANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996