THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:36:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Suite 6363
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 7 4033
Fax: (613) 737-8668

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastien Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gilbert (CPSO#: 70307 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Thoracic Surgery
6363 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Suite 6363
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 7 4033
Fax: (613) 737-8668

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastien Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gilbert (CPSO#: 70307 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Thoracic Surgery
6363 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIEN GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIEN GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996