THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:53:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710-700 Dorval Dr
Oakville ON L6K 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 202-9228
Fax: 1 855 366-3228
Address: 1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Phone: 4163357474
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 406 North Service Rd E
CANADA
Oakville ON L6H 5R2
Phone: 647 202-9228
Fax: 1 855 366-3228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hong (CPSO#: 70313 )
Business Address: 700 Dorval Drive
Ste 710
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V3
6472029228
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Dept of Anesthesiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710-700 Dorval Dr
Oakville ON L6K 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 202-9228
Fax: 1 855 366-3228
Address: 1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Phone: 4163357474
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 406 North Service Rd E
CANADA
Oakville ON L6H 5R2
Phone: 647 202-9228
Fax: 1 855 366-3228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hong (CPSO#: 70313 )
Business Address: 700 Dorval Drive
Ste 710
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V3
6472029228
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Dept of Anesthesiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON PYUNG HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON PYUNG HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996