THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:56:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 983 Burnham Street
Golden Plough Lodge
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 372 8759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodward & Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheung (CPSO#: 70320 ) Dr. R. Woodward (CPSO#: 70137 )
Business Address: 9A Elgin St E
Cobourg ON K9A 0A1
905-373-1280
Business Address: 201/203 - 316 King Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5R8
(905) 373-1246
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811
Business Address: 80 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
(800) 268-7096

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 983 Burnham Street
Golden Plough Lodge
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 372 8759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodward & Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cheung (CPSO#: 70320 ) Dr. R. Woodward (CPSO#: 70137 )
Business Address: 9A Elgin St E
Cobourg ON K9A 0A1
905-373-1280
Business Address: 201/203 - 316 King Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5R8
(905) 373-1246
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811
Business Address: 80 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
(800) 268-7096

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERESA PUI CHI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERESA PUI CHI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996