THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:38:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: 519 623-2546
Address: 123 Pioneer Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2A3
Phone: (519) 772-2322
Fax: (519) 772-2323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Dissanayake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dissanayake (CPSO#: 70324 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2300
Business Address: Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
(519) 623-4200
Business Address: B204-124 Pioneer Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2A3
(519) 772-2322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: 519 623-2546
Address: 123 Pioneer Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2A3
Phone: (519) 772-2322
Fax: (519) 772-2323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Dissanayake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dissanayake (CPSO#: 70324 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2300
Business Address: Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
(519) 623-4200
Business Address: B204-124 Pioneer Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2A3
(519) 772-2322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMINDA DISSANAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DISSANAYAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMINDA DISSANAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DISSANAYAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996