THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit A
378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-0064
Fax: (519) 272-0447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Bukala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bukala (CPSO#: 70332 )
Business Address: Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(518) 482-3440
Business Address: Wingham Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-3210
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210
Business Address: Unit A
378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
(519) 272-0064

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit A
378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-0064
Fax: (519) 272-0447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Bukala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bukala (CPSO#: 70332 )
Business Address: Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(518) 482-3440
Business Address: Wingham Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
(519) 357-3210
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210
Business Address: Unit A
378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
(519) 272-0064

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD PIOTR BUKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD PIOTR BUKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996