THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:52:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8707 Dufferin Street
Unit 15
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 844-444-5522
Fax: 844-444-1045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Levine (CPSO#: 70333 )
Business Address: 8707 Dufferin Street
Unit 15
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A2
844-444-5522

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8707 Dufferin Street
Unit 15
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 844-444-5522
Fax: 844-444-1045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Levine (CPSO#: 70333 )
Business Address: 8707 Dufferin Street
Unit 15
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A2
844-444-5522

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAH CHARLES LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAH CHARLES LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996