THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:26:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o St Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7428
Fax: (416) 867-7498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Meindok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McCabe (CPSO#: 70335 ) Dr. J. Meindok (CPSO#: 70339 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o St Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7428
Fax: (416) 867-7498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Meindok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McCabe (CPSO#: 70335 ) Dr. J. Meindok (CPSO#: 70339 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996