THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:55:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Donnelly-6
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: (416) 864-6014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Chien-Horng Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lin (CPSO#: 70336 )
Business Address: St Michaels Hospital
Shuter - 1
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Donnelly-6
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: (416) 864-6014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Chien-Horng Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lin (CPSO#: 70336 )
Business Address: St Michaels Hospital
Shuter - 1
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEN CHIEN-HORNG LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEN CHIEN-HORNG LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996