THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:53:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
6 Eaton North Room 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 340-3275
Fax: (416) 340-5029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George D. Oreopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Oreopoulos (CPSO#: 70346 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
6 Eaton North Room 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3275

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
6 Eaton North Room 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 340-3275
Fax: (416) 340-5029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George D. Oreopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Oreopoulos (CPSO#: 70346 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
6 Eaton North Room 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3275

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE DIMITRIOS OREOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE DIMITRIOS OREOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996