THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:37:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 311
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 466-2360
Fax: (416) 466-5076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ornstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ornstein (CPSO#: 70349 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 311 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
(416) 466-2360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 311
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 466-2360
Fax: (416) 466-5076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ornstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ornstein (CPSO#: 70349 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 311 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 5B9
(416) 466-2360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE PATRICE ORNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORNSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE PATRICE ORNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On November 26, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of malpractice was made against Dr. Melanie Ornstein.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On November 26, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of malpractice was made against Dr. Melanie Ornstein.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996