THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:58:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
West Wing, Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6227
Fax: 437-317-9777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amrit Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kang (CPSO#: 70356 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building West Wing
Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6227

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
West Wing, Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6227
Fax: 437-317-9777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amrit Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kang (CPSO#: 70356 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building West Wing
Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6227

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMRIT KAUR KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMRIT KAUR KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996