THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:02:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 58556
Fax: (905) 494-6614

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Kurtz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kurtz (CPSO#: 70357 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 58556
Fax: (905) 494-6614

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Kurtz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kurtz (CPSO#: 70357 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT KURTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT KURTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996