THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:48:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
525 Belmont Ave.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-6696
Fax: (519) 742-9520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Kilmurry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilmurry (CPSO#: 70363 )
Business Address: Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
(519) 742-6696

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
525 Belmont Ave.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-6696
Fax: (519) 742-9520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Kilmurry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilmurry (CPSO#: 70363 )
Business Address: Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
(519) 742-6696

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW RICHARD KILMURRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILMURRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW RICHARD KILMURRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILMURRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996