THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:40:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trinity Medical Centre
& Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-0008
Fax: (905) 895-1816
Address: Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ron Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Curtis (CPSO#: 70369 )
Business Address: Trinity Medical Centre & Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4V8
(905) 895-0008
Business Address: 15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
(905) 726-9722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trinity Medical Centre
& Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-0008
Fax: (905) 895-1816
Address: Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ron Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Curtis (CPSO#: 70369 )
Business Address: Trinity Medical Centre & Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4V8
(905) 895-0008
Business Address: 15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora Ontario L4G 7Y3
(905) 726-9722

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD DEAN CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD DEAN CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996