THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:02:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Digestive Health Clinic Inc
1031 Brock Road
Pickering Ontario L1W 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683 2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton St
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: 905 576 8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 705 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 09 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jurt Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jurt (CPSO#: 71390 ) Dr. K. Malhotra (CPSO#: 70370 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: Digestive Health Clinic Inc.
1031 Brock Road
Pickering Ontario L1W 3T7
(905) 683-1700
Business Address: Kingston Heart Clinic
416 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Address: Brampton Cardio Pulmonary Clinic
7 - 31 Centre Street South
Brampton Ontario L6W 2X7
(905) 455-3010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Digestive Health Clinic Inc
1031 Brock Road
Pickering Ontario L1W 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905 683 2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton St
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: 905 576 8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 705 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 09 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jurt Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jurt (CPSO#: 71390 ) Dr. K. Malhotra (CPSO#: 70370 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: Digestive Health Clinic Inc.
1031 Brock Road
Pickering Ontario L1W 3T7
(905) 683-1700
Business Address: Kingston Heart Clinic
416 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Address: Brampton Cardio Pulmonary Clinic
7 - 31 Centre Street South
Brampton Ontario L6W 2X7
(905) 455-3010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH SAMUEL MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH SAMUEL MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996