THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-1162
Fax: (416) 766-0463
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Giri Logsetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Logsetty (CPSO#: 70375 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
4167661162

Corporation Name: Logsetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Logsetty (CPSO#: 70375 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
(416) 766-1162
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-1162
Fax: (416) 766-0463
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Giri Logsetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Logsetty (CPSO#: 70375 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
4167661162

Corporation Name: Logsetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Logsetty (CPSO#: 70375 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
(416) 766-1162
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIRIDHAR LOGSETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGSETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIRIDHAR LOGSETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGSETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996