THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:30:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 10th St E
Centre for Personal Enhancement
Owen Sound ON N4K 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-371-1008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-5061 New St
Burlington Pediatric Dentistry
Burlington ON L7L 0G1
Phone: 9055921172
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106 Saint Paul Street
DOC+ Specialized & Focused Dental Centre
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 3P2
Phone: 705-444-6558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 230 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph Oral Surgery
Guelph ON N1H 7P8
Phone: 519-767-2886
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 208-585 Ontario St S
Milton Pediatric Dentistry
Milton ON L9T 2N2
Phone: 905-878-3030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 380 Dundas St E
Dentistry for Children
Unit D15
Oakville ON L6H 6Z9
Phone: 905-257-9922
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 137 Goderich Street
Bruce Grey Dental Centre
Port Elgin Ontario N0H 2C1
Phone: 519-832-3838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-55 Erb St E
Waterloo Oral Surgery
Waterloo ON N2J 4K8
Phone: 519-884-9199
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. K. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nair (CPSO#: 70381 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 372-2652
Business Address: 250 10th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 1S5
519-371-1008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 10th St E
Centre for Personal Enhancement
Owen Sound ON N4K 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-371-1008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-5061 New St
Burlington Pediatric Dentistry
Burlington ON L7L 0G1
Phone: 9055921172
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106 Saint Paul Street
DOC+ Specialized & Focused Dental Centre
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 3P2
Phone: 705-444-6558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 230 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph Oral Surgery
Guelph ON N1H 7P8
Phone: 519-767-2886
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 208-585 Ontario St S
Milton Pediatric Dentistry
Milton ON L9T 2N2
Phone: 905-878-3030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 380 Dundas St E
Dentistry for Children
Unit D15
Oakville ON L6H 6Z9
Phone: 905-257-9922
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 137 Goderich Street
Bruce Grey Dental Centre
Port Elgin Ontario N0H 2C1
Phone: 519-832-3838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-55 Erb St E
Waterloo Oral Surgery
Waterloo ON N2J 4K8
Phone: 519-884-9199
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. K. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nair (CPSO#: 70381 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 372-2652
Business Address: 250 10th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 1S5
519-371-1008

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
08 Apr 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 08 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 8th 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vinod Kunhiraman Nair in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nair to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. VINOD KUNHIRAMAN NAIR
(“Dr. Nair”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Nair, certificate of registration number 70381, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-385574-S6J5S4 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anaesthesiology practice and conduct, including my care and conduct in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and my prescribing of Ivermectin for COVID-19.

(4) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to restrict my practice to anaesthesiology.

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake not to prescribe ivermectin.

(7) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.” If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology. Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (7)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”

(c) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Nair, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (7)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).

(f) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.

(8) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Medical Record-Keeping Program, University of Toronto;

(ii) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Virtual Care, College policy;

2. Medical Records Management, College policy;

(iii) PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. I, Dr. Nair, will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program;

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that if any of the programs or policies listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nair in his anaesthesiology practice and conduct, including in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and his prescribing of Ivermectin for COVID-19, engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology.
Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin.
Dr. Nair shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology. Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Dr. Nair will engage in professional education, including in medical record keeping and professionalism.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;

(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 8th 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vinod Kunhiraman Nair in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nair to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. VINOD KUNHIRAMAN NAIR
(“Dr. Nair”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Nair, certificate of registration number 70381, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-385574-S6J5S4 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anaesthesiology practice and conduct, including my care and conduct in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and my prescribing of Ivermectin for COVID-19.

(4) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to restrict my practice to anaesthesiology.

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake not to prescribe ivermectin.

(7) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.” If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology. Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (7)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”

(c) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Nair, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (7)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).

(f) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.

(8) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Medical Record-Keeping Program, University of Toronto;

(ii) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Virtual Care, College policy;

2. Medical Records Management, College policy;

(iii) PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. I, Dr. Nair, will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program;

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that if any of the programs or policies listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Nair, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Nair, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nair in his anaesthesiology practice and conduct, including in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and his prescribing of Ivermectin for COVID-19, engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology.
Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin.
Dr. Nair shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology. Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Dr. Nair will engage in professional education, including in medical record keeping and professionalism.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;

(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 08 Apr 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr.
Vinod Kunhiraman Nair to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 8th, 2023:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nair in his anaesthesiology practice and conduct, including in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and his prescribing of Ivermectin for COVID-19, engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology.

Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin.

Dr. Nair shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology.
 
Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Dr. Nair will engage in professional education, including in medical record keeping and professionalism.


Source: Investigations and Resolutions Department
Effective Date: 03 Apr 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 08 Apr 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr.
Vinod Kunhiraman Nair to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 8th, 2023:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Nair in his anaesthesiology practice and conduct, including in relation to the COVID-19 pandemic and his prescribing of Ivermectin for COVID-19, engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology.

Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin.

Dr. Nair shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Nair’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology.
 
Dr. Nair must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Dr. Nair will engage in professional education, including in medical record keeping and professionalism.


Source: Investigations and Resolutions Department
Effective Date: 03 Apr 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996