THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:49:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5230 South Service Road
Halton Geriatric Mental Health Outreach Program
Unit 103
Burlington Ontario L7L 5P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-681-8233
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.B.W. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam (CPSO#: 70382 )
Business Address: Halton Geriatric Mental
Health Outreach Program
5230 South Service Road
Suite 103
Burlington Ontario L7L 5K2
(905) 681-8233
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5230 South Service Road
Halton Geriatric Mental Health Outreach Program
Unit 103
Burlington Ontario L7L 5P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-681-8233
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.B.W. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam (CPSO#: 70382 )
Business Address: Halton Geriatric Mental
Health Outreach Program
5230 South Service Road
Suite 103
Burlington Ontario L7L 5K2
(905) 681-8233
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BING WAH LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BING WAH LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996