THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: Landry, Sharon Mary (Used Until: 21 Apr 1998)
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M.L. Morrin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morrin (CPSO#: 70388 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: Landry, Sharon Mary (Used Until: 21 Apr 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M.L. Morrin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morrin (CPSO#: 70388 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON MARY LANDRY MORRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON MARY LANDRY MORRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996