THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:17:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 737 Silver Seven Road
Suites 8 & 9
Kanata Ontario K2V 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-3202
Fax: (613) 592-9225
Address: Med-Team Clinic
Suite 103
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: (613) 591-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik Hegmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hegmann (CPSO#: 70394 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 737 Silver Seven Road
Suites 8 & 9
Kanata Ontario K2V 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-3202
Fax: (613) 592-9225
Address: Med-Team Clinic
Suite 103
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: (613) 591-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik Hegmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hegmann (CPSO#: 70394 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK JOSEPH HEGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK JOSEPH HEGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996