THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Medical Arts Center
Suite 415
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-8340
Fax: (905) 607-7229
Address: West GTA Endoscopy
2225 Erin Mills Parkway Suite
Suit3 183
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S4
Phone: 9058230223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran A. Rasul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rasul (CPSO#: 70398 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4466
Business Address: West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
(905) 823-0223
Business Address: Credit Valley Medical Arts Center
415 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 607-8340
Business Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Medical Arts Center
Suite 415
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-8340
Fax: (905) 607-7229
Address: West GTA Endoscopy
2225 Erin Mills Parkway Suite
Suit3 183
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S4
Phone: 9058230223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran A. Rasul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rasul (CPSO#: 70398 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4466
Business Address: West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
(905) 823-0223
Business Address: Credit Valley Medical Arts Center
415 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 607-8340
Business Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMRAN ASHEQUE RASUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMRAN ASHEQUE RASUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996