THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 180
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 345 Harry Walker Pky S
Newmarket ON L3Y 8P6
Phone: 905-953-7685
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health- Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vito Sorrento Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sorrento (CPSO#: 70400 )
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 180
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-3330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 180
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 345 Harry Walker Pky S
Newmarket ON L3Y 8P6
Phone: 905-953-7685
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health- Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vito Sorrento Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sorrento (CPSO#: 70400 )
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 180
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-3330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VITO ANTHONY SORRENTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORRENTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VITO ANTHONY SORRENTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORRENTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996