THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 15
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: (416) 506-0680

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Robb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Robb (CPSO#: 70401 )
Business Address: Suite 15
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
(416) 595-1521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 15
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: (416) 506-0680

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Robb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Robb (CPSO#: 70401 )
Business Address: Suite 15
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R2
(416) 595-1521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDERSON ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDERSON ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996