THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:18:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Witty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Witty (CPSO#: 70406 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 792-3333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Witty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Witty (CPSO#: 70406 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 792-3333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA JANE WITTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA JANE WITTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996