THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:01:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 7-824
Department of Med Oncology
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2263
Fax: (416) 946-4467

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. X Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Chen (CPSO#: 70408 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
5-719 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 7-824
Department of Med Oncology
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2263
Fax: (416) 946-4467

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. X Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Chen (CPSO#: 70408 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
5-719 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XUEYU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XUEYU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996